+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-46
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 328
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 67
- Senate Calendar Number 77
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 218
- Yeas: 139
- Absent: 12
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 94 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (15)
Housing Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor