+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7327
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 218
- File Number 440
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor