+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-94
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- In Concurrence
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 503
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5133
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5161
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Environment
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 198
- File Number 285
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 268 SENATE AMD A
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 8
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 269 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 284 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor