+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 226
- File Number 325
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Sponsors (2)
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor