+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 442
- Senate Calendar Number 273
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor