+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-211
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 447
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4213
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 632
- Senate Calendar Number 403
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 6
April 19, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 133
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2