+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-168
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 544
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- In Concurrence
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5690
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4106
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 286
- File Number 419
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (20)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 301 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 380 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor