+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-33
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 550
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 631
- Senate Calendar Number 402
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 232
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
April 29, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 260
- Yeas: 36