+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-245
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 508
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6672
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 87
- Senate Calendar Number 113
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 368 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
May 6, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 138
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor