+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 533
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5468
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3986
- Matter Pass Retained
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 349
- File Number 518
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 328 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 268 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3986
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor