+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-203
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 505
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4946
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 556
- Senate Calendar Number 347
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 204
- Yeas: 36