+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-68
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 470
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 167
- File Number 183
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 280
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 6
April 24, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 185 PASS
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor