+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-31
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 475
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 232
- Senate Calendar Number 189
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 205
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 12
April 24, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 186 PASS
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (24)
Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor