+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-173
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 445
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 577
- Senate Calendar Number 366
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 6
April 19, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 126
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1