+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Act 14-21
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5236
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5224
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 446
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3735
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 311
- File Number 481
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 381 PASS
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 6
May 5, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 249 HOUSE AMD B
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 90
- Absent: 7
May 5, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 250 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 6
April 22, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 145 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3735
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 146 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor