+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 516
- Senate Calendar Number 320
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Vote
March 29, 2018: ET Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor