+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-117
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 488
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 283
- Senate Calendar Number 205
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
April 30, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 230 PASS
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor