+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Sponsors (3)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor