+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 164
- File Number 182
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development