+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 161
- File Number 307
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor