+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Children
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Children
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference Children
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Sponsors (4)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor