+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-30
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 444
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 375
- File Number 566
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 201
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 9
April 22, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 139 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor