+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-175
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 542
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 145
- Senate Calendar Number 163
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 330
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 13
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 195 PASS Order of the Day
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (35)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor