+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 105
- Senate Calendar Number 142
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Sponsors (3)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor