+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-44
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 464
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 217
- File Number 280
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 228
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 173 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (5)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor