+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 463
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 323
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 236
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Vote
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 151 PASS
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor