+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 173
- File Number 231
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor