+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Special Act 14-3
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- In Concurrence
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 327
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 171
- File Number 229
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 188
- Yeas: 138
- Absent: 13
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 86 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (29)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor