+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Special Act 16-18
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 444
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4232
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 170
- Senate Calendar Number 159
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 6
April 19, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 121
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1