+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Act 22-135
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 551
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5594
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- File Number 152
- Senate Calendar Number 139
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor