+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor