+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 374
- File Number 565
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Sponsors (5)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor