+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 456
- Senate Calendar Number 299
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor