+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 442
- File Number 654
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement