+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Environment
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 178
- File Number 227
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor