+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 142
- Senate Calendar Number 172
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsors (2)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor