+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 163
- Senate Calendar Number 128
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Vote
March 14, 2018: VA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor