+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 186
- File Number 226
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor