+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Human Services
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 64
- Senate Calendar Number 102
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 01/29
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor