+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 385
- File Number 560
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding