+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion Failed JF
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7191
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 310
- Senate Calendar Number 155
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor