+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 185
- File Number 225
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor