+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 81
- Senate Calendar Number 122
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate