+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 294
- File Number 455
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor