+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion Failed JF
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 107
- File Number 119
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsors (2)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor