+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-110
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 458
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 368
- File Number 539
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 148
- Absent: 3
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 161 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (6)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor