+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 527
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5082
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4953
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 214
- Senate Calendar Number 185
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 220 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5082
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 21
April 29, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 221 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 36