+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/14 5:00 PM
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 662
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 302
- File Number 478
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor