+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 551
- Senate Calendar Number 345
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/29
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections