+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-78
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
On May 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 538
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 4375
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4890
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 26
- Senate Calendar Number 57
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2018: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 16
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor